ASTRAZENECA LP et al v. HEC PHARM CO., LTD. et al
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA LP and ASTRAZENECA AB
Defendant: HEC PHARM USA and HEC PHARM CO., LTD.
Case Number: 2:2019cv14737
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney RAVIN R. PATEL terminated. (PATEL, RAVIN)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint is hereby extended through and including September 9, 2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 7/15/2019. (ld, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from John E. Flaherty to the Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case Number 3:19-cv-14737. Case reallocated to Newark and reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp, Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/9/2019. (jjc)
July 9, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.5 Patent Pilot Project, case shall be reassigned to a designated patent judge. (gxh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HEC PHARM CO., LTD., HEC PHARM USA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jdb)
July 8, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RAVIN R. PATEL on behalf of ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED (PATEL, RAVIN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent.. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HEC PHARM CO., LTD., HEC PHARM USA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9792284), filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASTRAZENECA LP et al v. HEC PHARM CO., LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA LP
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA AB
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEC PHARM USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEC PHARM CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?