AKABUOGU v. ANDERSON
Petitioner: UCHE AKABUOGU and CHARLES UCHE AKABUOGU
Respondent: WILLIAM ANDERSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv15249
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WILLIAM ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Burgus, #2 Exhibit A (Notice to Appear), #3 Exhibit B (Form I-213), #4 Exhibit C (Bond Decision), #5 Exhibit D (IJ Order), #6 Certificate of Service)(DHARIA, KRUTI)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney KRUTI D. DHARIA for CHARLES UCHE AKABUOGU added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney KRUTI D. DHARIA for WILLIAM ANDERSON added.. (DHARIA, KRUTI)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER, that the Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition and this Order upon William Anderson by regular mail, with all costs of service advanced by the United States and it is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Order to Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office at USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/12/2019. (JB, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW040019.), filed by UCHE AKABUOGU. (Attachments: #1 Application for issuance of order to show cause)(th, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AKABUOGU v. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM ANDERSON
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UCHE AKABUOGU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHARLES UCHE AKABUOGU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?