POPA v. PEREZ et al
Plaintiff: VANESSA PEREZ and ALEXANDRU POPA
Defendant: MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, MERCEDES BENZ CORPORATION, XYZ COMPANIES 1-100 and JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-100)
Case Number: 2:2019cv15309
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by MERCEDES BENZ CORPORATION. (SCHURKO, NICOLAI)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Cross-Claim, CROSSCLAIM against JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-100), VANESSA PEREZ, XYZ COMPANIES 1-100 by MERCEDES BENZ CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALEXANDRU POPA. MERCEDES BENZ CORPORATION served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons summons)(RICCO, ROBERT)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALEXANDRU POPA. VANESSA PEREZ served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons summons)(RICCO, ROBERT)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ALEXANDRU POPA re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by counsel with certification of service at end of brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit EX 2 unpublished opinion)(RICCO, ROBERT)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT AS OF RIGHT within 21 days against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ALEXANDRU POPA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A Police Report, #2 Exhibit EX B Police, #3 Exhibit Ex C Loss Evaluation, #4 Exhibit EX D Recall Information, #5 Certification of Service)(RICCO, ROBERT)
July 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by MERCEDES BENZ CORPORATION. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLAI ANDREW SCHURKO on behalf of MERCEDES BENZ CORPORATION (SCHURKO, NICOLAI)
July 15, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption CORRECTED DEFENDANT MERCEDES BENZ USA,Cause of Action CHANGED CAUSE OF ACTION TO 28;1441 NOTICE OF REMOVAL PRODUCT LIABILITY,Party Information ADDED ADDITIONAL PARTIES FROM CAPTION OF CASES AND CORRECTED PARTY ROLE, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (bt, )
July 15, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC identifying Daimler North America Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC from Superior Court of Hudson County, case number HUD-L-2467-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9810861), filed by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(BLUM, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POPA v. PEREZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCEDES BENZ CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: NICOLAI ANDREW SCHURKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ COMPANIES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA PEREZ
Represented By: ROBERT G. RICCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDRU POPA
Represented By: ROBERT G. RICCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?