RED BULL GMBH et al v. KEARNY BEVERAGE, INC.
Plaintiff: RED BULL GMBH and RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Defendant: KEARNY BEVERAGE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv15390
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER; granting (ECF. No.9) Defendant letter request for a 30 day extension of time to September 20, 2019, for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/20/2019. (sms)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER; granting #9 Defendant letter request for a 30 day extension of time to September 20, 2019, for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/20/2019. (sms)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Kenneth S. Weitzman to Judge Arleo re the parties' request for an extension of time. (WEITZMAN, KENNETH)
August 5, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KEARNY BEVERAGE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/21/2019. (sms)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Kearny Beverage, Inc... (WEITZMAN, KENNETH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEARNY BEVERAGE, INC.. (WEITZMAN, KENNETH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH SCOTT WEITZMAN on behalf of KEARNY BEVERAGE, INC. (WEITZMAN, KENNETH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, CIS, Corporate Disclosure Statement & Form AO120 served on Kearny Beverage, Inc. (Scott Pyper) on 7/17/2019, filed by RED BULL GMBH, RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (BARTLETT, JOHN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RED BULL GMBH, RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC. identifying RED BULL GMBH as Corporate Parent.. (BARTLETT, JOHN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (bt, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KEARNY BEVERAGE, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
July 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEARNY BEVERAGE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9817038), filed by RED BULL GMBH, RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BARTLETT, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RED BULL GMBH et al v. KEARNY BEVERAGE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RED BULL GMBH
Represented By: JOHN W. BARTLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: JOHN W. BARTLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEARNY BEVERAGE, INC.
Represented By: KENNETH SCOTT WEITZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?