LINDSEY v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: DOROTHY E. LINDSEY
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv15423
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (nic, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Defendant's Motion to Remand #7 is Granted. This case shall be remanded to the Commissioner. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/28/2019. (sm)
August 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARKOS, EMILY)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DOROTHY E. LINDSEY. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (DERANEY, DANIEL)
August 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Edward A. Wicklund: $ 150, receipt number NEW040264 (sm)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward A. Wicklund; counsel shall pay the Clerk of the Court $150 and pay the fee to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/25/2019. (sm)
July 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward A. Wicklund. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward A. Wicklund by DOROTHY E. LINDSEY. (Attachments: #1 Certified Statement of Applicant, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DERANEY, DANIEL)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
July 19, 2019 COMPLAINT #1 against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by DOROTHY E. LINDSEY. (IFP Granted)(sm)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff be permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs or security thereof; the Clerk shall file the Complaint without prepayment of the filing fee; the Clerk of the Court shall issue a summons. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/19/2019. (sm)
July 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty. (ak, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, received in by DOROTHY E. LINDSEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DERANEY, DANIEL) Modified on 7/17/2019 (bt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #4 Text of Proposed Order) (bt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINDSEY v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: EMILY BRESLIN MARKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY E. LINDSEY
Represented By: DANIEL FAY DERANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?