JOHNSON v. CARLUCCI et al
Plaintiff: LUKE JOHNSON
Defendant: SYED T. KAMAL, JONATHAN L. WILCOX, THOMAS W. ERICKSON, STEVEN M. SILVER, SUSANNE V. CLARK, ROBERT H. FISH, JARED S. HENDRICKS, JOSEPH A. CARLUCCI, PATRICK T. RYAN, JASON M. BOUCHER, JOHN M. JURELLER, AMERICAN RENAL ASSOCIATES HOLDINGS, INC. and MICHAEL E. BOXER
Case Number: 2:2019cv15812
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Gregory Mortenson, requesting re-assignment to Judge Salas pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(c)-(e). (MORTENSON, GREGORY)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, and [PROPOSED] Order Regarding Adjournment of ARA's Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by AMERICAN RENAL ASSOCIATES HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MORTENSON, GREGORY)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN RENAL ASSOCIATES HOLDINGS, INC.. (MORTENSON, GREGORY)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY STEPHEN MORTENSON on behalf of AMERICAN RENAL ASSOCIATES HOLDINGS, INC. (MORTENSON, GREGORY)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on American Renal Associates Holdings, Inc. on 7/26/2019, filed by LUKE JOHNSON. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN RENAL ASSOCIATES HOLDINGS, INC., JASON M. BOUCHER, MICHAEL E. BOXER, JOSEPH A. CARLUCCI, SUSANNE V. CLARK, THOMAS W. ERICKSON, ROBERT H. FISH, JARED S. HENDRICKS, JOHN M. JURELLER, SYED T. KAMAL, PATRICK T. RYAN, STEVEN M. SILVER, JONATHAN L. WILCOX. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
July 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUKE JOHNSON. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by LUKE JOHNSON as to AMERICAN RENAL ASSOCIATES HOLDINGS, INC., JASON M. BOUCHER, MICHAEL E. BOXER, JOSEPH A. CARLUCCI, SUSANNE V. CLARK, THOMAS W. ERICKSON, ROBERT H. FISH, JARED S. HENDRICKS, JOHN M. JURELLER, SYED T. KAMAL, PATRICK T. RYAN, STEVEN M. SILVER, JONATHAN L. WILCOX. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN RENAL ASSOCIATES HOLDINGS, INC., JASON M. BOUCHER, MICHAEL E. BOXER, JOSEPH A. CARLUCCI, SUSANNE V. CLARK, THOMAS W. ERICKSON, ROBERT H. FISH, JARED S. HENDRICKS, JOHN M. JURELLER, SYED T. KAMAL, PATRICK T. RYAN, STEVEN M. SILVER, JONATHAN L. WILCOX ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9843543) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LUKE JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. CARLUCCI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYED T. KAMAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN L. WILCOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS W. ERICKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN M. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSANNE V. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT H. FISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARED S. HENDRICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH A. CARLUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK T. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON M. BOUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN M. JURELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN RENAL ASSOCIATES HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: GREGORY STEPHEN MORTENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL E. BOXER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUKE JOHNSON
Represented By: LAURENCE M. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?