KARAKOC v. AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ERHAN KARAKOC
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATION I-V (these names being fictitious as their present identities are unknown), JULIE ZOZZARO, AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., JOHN DOE I-V (these names being fictitious as their present identities are unknown) and JANE DOE I-V (these names being fictitious as their present identities are unknown)
Case Number: 2:2019cv15850
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., JULIE ZOZZARO.(WORTHY, SABRINA)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 12:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 11/21/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/7/2019. (jqb, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., JULIE ZOZZARO identifying American Airlines Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (WORTHY, SABRINA)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SABRINA S. WORTHY on behalf of AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., JULIE ZOZZARO (WORTHY, SABRINA)
July 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action was changed to 29;2601 Family Medical Leave Act, Jurisdiction was changed to Federal Question, Nature of Suit changed to 751 Family Medical Leave ActParty Information, corrected fictitious information to party text . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (bt, )
July 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The application for extension of time to answer filed by Eric Savage on July 26, 2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future filings of this type of documents please use the event application for clerk's order for extension of time found in the other documents menu. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (bt, )
July 26, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Or Otherwise Reply Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(b) filed by JULIE ZOZZARO, AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. submitted by JULIE ZOZZARO, AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/16/2019. (bt, )
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Or Otherwise Reply Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(b) by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., JULIE ZOZZARO. (SAVAGE, ERIC)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. identifying American Airlines Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SAVAGE, ERIC)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JULIE ZOZZARO, AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. from New Jersey Superior Court, Law Division, Union County, case number UNN-L-001790-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9845906), filed by JULIE ZOZZARO, AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Adverse Party, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAVAGE, ERIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KARAKOC v. AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATION I-V (these names being fictitious as their present identities are unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE ZOZZARO
Represented By: ERIC A. SAVAGE
Represented By: SABRINA S. WORTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: ERIC A. SAVAGE
Represented By: SABRINA S. WORTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE I-V (these names being fictitious as their present identities are unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE I-V (these names being fictitious as their present identities are unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERHAN KARAKOC
Represented By: GREGORY B. NOBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?