BAREL et al v. FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Appellant: ARIEL BAREL
Appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv16054
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Appellant's BRIEF by ARIEL BAREL. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Appendix Volume I, #2 Appellant's Appendix Volume II, #3 Appellant's Appendix Volume III, #4 Appellant's Table of Transcripts)(dam, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER denying #7 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/3/2019. (ps, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 COUNTER DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by ARIEL BAREL re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court's docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable ESTHER SALAS, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as 'Courtesy Copies' and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically; the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee's brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(dam, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by ARIEL BAREL to Receive Documents Electronically (dam, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order by ARIEL BAREL. (dam, )
August 16, 2019 Bankruptcy Appeal set for 12/2/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. (dam, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF ISSUES and DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal by ARIEL BAREL re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court's docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court's records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable ESTHER SALASE, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as 'Courtesy Copies' and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically; the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant's brief; the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee's brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(dam, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Pleading to District Court, #2 Copy of Notice of Appeal, #3 Copy of Order Under Appeal, #4 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Appeal)(dam, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER denying #3 Appellant's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/9/2019. (dam, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Injunctive or Other Relief to Stay Eviction Pending Appeal by ARIEL BAREL. (dam, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER ORDER. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/30/2019. (ps, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-11416-JKS, filed by ARIEL BAREL. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(dam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAREL et al v. FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ARIEL BAREL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?