RAMPERSAUD v. BARR et al
Petitioner: Charran Rampersaud
Respondent: STEVEN AHRENDT, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, WILLIAM P. BARR, Field office Directo susan quintana and SUSAN QUINTANA
Case Number: 2:2019cv16070
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Michael Z. Goldman, Esq. $ 150, receipt number NEW040495. (sms)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for STEVEN AHRENDT,ENES HAJDARPASIC for WILLIAM P. BARR,ENES HAJDARPASIC for KEVIN K. MCALEENAN,ENES HAJDARPASIC for SUSAN QUINTANA added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER; The Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition and this Order upon Respondent by regular mail, with all costs of service advanced by the United States; the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Order to Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorneys Office, at the following email address: USANJHabeasCases@ usdoj.gov; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Petition within 30 days after the answer is filed; within 7 days after any change in Petitioner's immigration or custody status, be it release, a final order of removal, or otherwise, Respondents shall electronically file a written notice of the same with the Clerk of the Court; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/3/2019. (sms)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER; granting #3 Motion for the Pro Hac Vice admission of Michael Z. Goldman, Esq.; counsel shall make payment of $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court in accordance with L.Civ.R.101.1(c)(2) and New Jersey Court Rule 1:28-2 within twenty (20) days from the date of the entry of this Order; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/3/2019. (sms)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHARRAN RAMPERSAUD. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MARK, ERIC)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Esther Salas for all further proceedings. Judge Madeline Cox Arleo no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/31/19. (ak, )
July 30, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo added. (eu, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0312-9854708.), filed by Charran Rampersaud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARK, ERIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMPERSAUD v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEVEN AHRENDT
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field office Directo susan quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUSAN QUINTANA
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charran Rampersaud
Represented By: ERIC M. MARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?