SIVIGNY v. MEDIDATA SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT SIVIGNY
Defendant: NEIL KURTZ, MEDIDATA SOLUTIONS, INC., TAREK SHERIF, GLEN DE VRIES, CARLOS DOMINGUEZ, ROBERT B. TAYLOR, GEORGE MCCULLOCH, LEE SHAPIRO and MARIA RIVAS
Case Number: 2:2019cv16113
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as moot. Defendants have not served an answer or motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/20/2019. (sm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBERT SIVIGNY (HALPER, ZACHARY)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLEN DE VRIES, CARLOS DOMINGUEZ, NEIL KURTZ, GEORGE MCCULLOCH, MEDIDATA SOLUTIONS, INC., MARIA RIVAS, LEE SHAPIRO, TAREK SHERIF, ROBERT B. TAYLOR. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
July 31, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT SIVIGNY as to GLEN DE VRIES, CARLOS DOMINGUEZ, NEIL KURTZ, GEORGE MCCULLOCH, MEDIDATA SOLUTIONS, INC., MARIA RIVAS, LEE SHAPIRO, TAREK SHERIF, ROBERT B. TAYLOR. (HALPER, ZACHARY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROBERT SIVIGNY. (HALPER, ZACHARY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLEN DE VRIES, CARLOS DOMINGUEZ, NEIL KURTZ, GEORGE MCCULLOCH, MEDIDATA SOLUTIONS, INC., MARIA RIVAS, LEE SHAPIRO, TAREK SHERIF, ROBERT B. TAYLOR ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9856096) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ROBERT SIVIGNY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HALPER, ZACHARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIVIGNY v. MEDIDATA SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL KURTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDIDATA SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAREK SHERIF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLEN DE VRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS DOMINGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT B. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE MCCULLOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA RIVAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SIVIGNY
Represented By: ZACHARY HALPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?