INFINITI OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC v. NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: INFINITI OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC
Defendant: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv16168
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/9/2019. (seb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (YU, JAMES)
August 1, 2019 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. identifying Nissan Motor Co. Ltd as Corporate Parent.. (YU, JAMES)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-005489-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9859735), filed by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(YU, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INFINITI OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC v. NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: JAMES S. YU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INFINITI OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC
Represented By: CHARLES ANDREW GALLAER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?