WRIGHT v. ANDERSON
Petitioner: JEAN-CLAUDE WRIGHT
Respondent: WILLIAM ANDERSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv16282
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Respondent's time to file an answer to the habeas petition filed by Petitioner is extended until 10/4/2019; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the habeas petition within 45 days after the answer is filed. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/23/2019. (sm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Request for Extension of Time to Answer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for WILLIAM ANDERSON added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk shall serve copies of the petition #1 and this memorandum and order on respondent by regular mail; the Clerk shall forward a copy of this memorandum and order to the Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office at the following email address: USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov; within 45 days of the entry of this memorandum and order the respondent shall file and serve an answer; within 45 days of receipt of the answer, petitioner may file a reply to the answer; within 7 days of petitioner's release, by parole or otherwise, respondent shall electronically file a written notice of same with the Clerk. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/6/2019. (sm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW040219.), filed by JEAN-CLAUDE WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM ANDERSON
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEAN-CLAUDE WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?