SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. HUG et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: KURT W. STREAMS and GERARD F. HUG
Case Number: 2:2019cv16290
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. GERARD F. HUG waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (MILLER, GREGORY)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GERARD F. HUG, KURT W. STREAMS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
August 5, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption- corrected caption to reflect plaintiff, Party Information- corrected plaintiff and defendants names, Other- modified complaint's docket text to reflect complaint against defendants . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ams, )
August 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GERARD F. HUG, KURT W. STREAMS with JURY DEMAND, filed by SECURITIES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, GREGORY) Modified on 8/5/2019 (ams, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. HUG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KURT W. STREAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERARD F. HUG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: GREGORY NELSON MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?