RAHEEM v. WARDEN OF HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONS JAIL et al
Petitioner: YUSUF RAHEEM
Respondent: WARDEN OF HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONS JAIL and DHS/ICE
Case Number: 2:2019cv16551
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Yusef Raheem requesting for a New Jersey/Federal Bond to be Released from Custody whilst on Trial; etc (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(sms)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER granting (ECF # 1-4) Application to proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Order to Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorneys Office. Within 45 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondents shall electronically file a full and complete answer to said Petition. Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Petition within 30 days after the answer is filed. etc. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/27/2019. (dam, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Yusef Raheem requesting for a New Jersey/Federal Bond to be released from custody while on trial; etc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Application IFP, #3 Application IFP on Appeal, #4 Envelope)(sms)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by YUSUF RAHEEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Application IFP, #5 Envelope)(qa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAHEEM v. WARDEN OF HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONS JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YUSUF RAHEEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN OF HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONS JAIL
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DHS/ICE
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?