JNPIERRE v. WALMART, INC.
Plaintiff: MARYLENE JNPIERRE
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, WALMART STORES, INC. and XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv16600
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Scheduling Conference held on 9/9/2019. (as, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/9/2019. (as, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover letter to Judge)(ROWBOTHAM, ROBERT)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CHARLES ROWBOTHAM, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ROWBOTHAM, ROBERT)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for 8/29/2019 at 11:00 AM is hereby adjourned to 9/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/28/2019. (as, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Robert C. Rowbotham, II, Esq.. (ROWBOTHAM, ROBERT)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD SOLENSKY on behalf of WALMART STORES, INC. (SOLENSKY, EDWARD)
August 21, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Answer to Complaint #3 along with the previous filings submitted by Floyd Cottrell, Esq. on 8/13/2019 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. All documents have been signed by Francois D. Prophete, Esq. The assigned attorney should provide his/her signature on the documents. Please enter an appearance on behalf of Defendant and please use your assigned account to file any additional documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sms)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/14/2019. (as, )
August 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
August 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WALMART, INC..(COTTRELL, FLOYD)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART, INC.. (COTTRELL, FLOYD)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART, INC. from Essex County Superior Court, case number ESX-L-5059-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9888524), filed by WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(COTTRELL, FLOYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JNPIERRE v. WALMART, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARYLENE JNPIERRE
Represented By: FRANCOIS D. PROPHETE
Represented By: ROBERT CHARLES ROWBOTHAM, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART STORES, INC.
Represented By: FLOYD G. COTTRELL
Represented By: FRANCOIS D. PROPHETE
Represented By: EDWARD SOLENSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?