Ryan et al v. Quest Diagnostics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Ryan and Melissa Ryan
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC. and QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv16666
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 8/14/19 from the Southern District of California 3:19-cv-01098 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 14, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01098. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred to District of District of New Jersey. Files transferred electronically to: *District of District of New Jersey*.*Martin Luther King Building & U.S. Courthouse, 50 Walnut St.**Newark, NJ 07101-0419* (Attachments: #1 MDL 2904 CTO-1) (jdt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Garcia, Lisa) (sjm).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING ON CONSOLIDATIONAND TRANSFER BY JPML re #5 Motion to Stay. Case stayed until seven (7) days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) issues a ruling as to whether this action should be consolidated and transferred into the MDL proceeding In re American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL Docket No. 2904. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/15/2019. (sjm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML by Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Garcia In Support of Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings)(Garcia, Lisa)Attorney Lisa L Garcia added to party Optum360 Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (sjm).
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Ryan, Daniel Ryan. Optum360 Services, Inc. served. (Godino, Marc) (sjm).
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Ryan, Daniel Ryan. Quest Diagnostics, Inc. served. (Godino, Marc) (sjm).
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Medical Collection Agency, Optum360 Services, Inc., Quest Diagnostics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12610829.), filed by Melissa Ryan, Daniel Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01098-JM-BLM. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Godino, Marc)(als) 9 (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan et al v. Quest Diagnostics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Lisa L Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ryan
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Ryan
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?