Webb v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Webb
Defendant: OPTUM360 LLC and QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv16670
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 8/14/19 from the Northern District of Illinois 1:19-cv-04157 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 14, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04157. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSFERRED to the New Jersey the electronic record. (nsf, )
August 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2904 Conditional Transfer Order filed 08/12/2019. (nsf, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to District of New Jersey.(nsf, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Joint motion and stipulation for stay of proceedings pending consolidation and transfer by JPML #14 is granted. Scheduling Conference previously set for 9/25/2019 is stricken. Status hearing is set for 9/25/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 8/15/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Optum360, LLC by Patricia Brown Holmes (Holmes, Patricia)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Optum360, LLC (Perry, Rodney)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Rodney Perry for presentment of motion to stay #14 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Perry, Rodney)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Optum360, LLC to stay of Proceedings Pending Consolidation and Transfer by JPML (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Perry, Rodney)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Optum360, LLC by Rodney Perry Appearance (Perry, Rodney)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated by Daniel Cochran Craig (Craig, Daniel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Quest Diagnostics Incorporated (Hoffman, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated by David Henry Hoffman (Hoffman, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Webb as to Optum360, LLC on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Carroll, Katrina)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Webb as to Quest Diagnostics Incorporated on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Carroll, Katrina)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 9/20/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
June 26, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Optum360, LLC, Quest Diagnostics Incorporated (ec, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Webb by Carey Alexander (Alexander, Carey)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Webb by Erin Green Comite (Comite, Erin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Webb by Joseph P Guglielmo (Guglielmo, Joseph)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
June 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Webb by Katrina Carroll (Carroll, Katrina)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by Matthew Webb; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15951777. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carroll, Katrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 LLC
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
Represented By: David Henry Hoffman
Represented By: Daniel Cochran Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Webb
Represented By: KATRINA CARROLL
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: JOSEPH P. GUGLIELMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?