Sean DeMarco v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Sean DeMarco
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC., RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR and QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv16685
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 8/14/19 from the Central District of California 2:19-cv-05071 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 27 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 14, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-05071. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2904, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey and assigned to Honorable Madeline C. Arleo. Case transferred electronically. (twdb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Akerman, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation for Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling on Consolidated and Transfer by JPML #19 . All proceedings and deadlines in this action are stayed in their entirety until seven (7)days after the JPML issues a ruling as to whether this action should be consolidated and transferred into a MDL proceeding in In re American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL Docket No. 2904. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Made JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc., identifying Optum360 Services, Inc., Optum Rocket, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumInsight Holdings, LLC, Optum, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Akerman, Alexander)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc. identifying Optum Rocket, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumInsight Holdings, LLC, Optum, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated as Corporate Parent. (Akerman, Alexander)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Petition to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation [Local Rule 83-1.4.3.] filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Akerman, Alexander)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML)(Akerman, Alexander)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Akerman counsel for Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. Adding Alexander Akerman as counsel of record for Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Attorney Alexander Akerman added to party Optum360 Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Akerman, Alexander)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, identifying BlackRock Inc., Vanguard Group, American International Group, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Zurich American Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc., Freedom Specialty Insurance Company. (Lally, Amy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy P Lally counsel for Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. Adding Amy P. Lally as counsel of record for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (Attorney Amy P Lally added to party Quest Diagnostics Incorporated(pty:dft))(Lally, Amy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Sean DeMarco, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 , Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #10 served on 06/19/2019. (Blood, Timothy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sean DeMarco, upon Defendant American Medical Collection Agency served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Blood, Timothy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sean DeMarco, upon Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Blood, Timothy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sean DeMarco, upon Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Blood, Timothy)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01091 DOC(KESx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05071 DOC(KESx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Sean DeMarco. Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases, Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings, and Notice of Petition to the JPML Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01019-DOC-KES, 5:19-cv-01029-JGB-SHK (Blood, Timothy)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants American Medical Collection Agency, Optum360 Services, Inc., and Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (jtil)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sean DeMarco, (Blood, Timothy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Sean DeMarco. (Blood, Timothy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sean DeMarco. (Blood, Timothy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23902417 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Sean DeMarco. (Attorney Timothy G Blood added to party Sean DeMarco(pty:pla))(Blood, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sean DeMarco v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Alexander Akerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
Represented By: Amy P. Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean DeMarco
Represented By: Thomas Joseph O'Reardon, II
Represented By: TIMOTHY G. BLOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?