LIPPMAN v. GLICKMAN et al

Plaintiff: STEPHEN S. LIPPMAN
Defendant: RICHARD B. GLICKMAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv16691
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION; The parties hereto, by and between their counsel, hereby stipulate as follows: Each Defendant may have until and including October 4, 2019 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint herein is no more than 44-days after a response to the Complaint would otherwise be due; etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 8/22/2019. (sms)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by RICHARD B. GLICKMAN, RICHARD B. GLICKMAN. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
August 14, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal and related attachments filed on 8/14/19 show a different address and firm name for Plaintiff's attorney, Kenneth K. Lehn, that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jc, )
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RICHARD B. GLICKMAN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, RICHARD B. GLICKMAN from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-3050-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9894415), filed by RICHARD B. GLICKMAN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, RICHARD B. GLICKMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Richard B. Glickman)(GREENBERG, BRUCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIPPMAN v. GLICKMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN S. LIPPMAN
Represented By: KENNETH KAUFMANN LEHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD B. GLICKMAN
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?