BUCKHEAD MEAT COMPANY v. AEBB OF GREENWICH CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: BUCKHEAD MEAT COMPANY
Defendant: CTK STEAKHOUSE CORP., AEBB OF GREENWICH CORPORATION, BLACKSTONE'S OF SOUTHPORT, INC. and EDIN AHMETAJ
Case Number: 2:2019cv16766
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/17/2019. (seb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(OROZCO, MICHAEL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BUCKHEAD MEAT COMPANY identifying SYSCO CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (SANTOMAURO, CYNTHIA)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AEBB OF GREENWICH CORPORATION, EDIN AHMETAJ, BLACKSTONE'S OF SOUTHPORT, INC., CTK STEAKHOUSE CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEBB OF GREENWICH CORPORATION D/B/A BLACKSTONE STEAKHOUSE OF GREENWICH, EDIN AHMETAJ, BLACKSTONE'S OF SOUTHPORT, INC. D/B/A BLACKSTONES STEAKHOUSE NORWALK, CTK STEAKHOUSE CORP. D/B/A BLACKSTONES STEAKHOUSE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9897797), filed by BUCKHEAD MEAT COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons AEBB, #3 Summons E. AHMETAJ, #4 Summons CTK STEAKHOUSE, #5 Summons BLACKSTONES SOUTHPORT NORWALK, #6 Summons BLACKSTONES SOUTHPORT GRILLE)(SANTOMAURO, CYNTHIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUCKHEAD MEAT COMPANY v. AEBB OF GREENWICH CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTK STEAKHOUSE CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL A. OROZCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEBB OF GREENWICH CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL A. OROZCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKSTONE'S OF SOUTHPORT, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL A. OROZCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDIN AHMETAJ
Represented By: MICHAEL A. OROZCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUCKHEAD MEAT COMPANY
Represented By: CYNTHIA D. SANTOMAURO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?