UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE CO. v. RBH-TRB 81 MARKET, LLC
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE CO.
Defendant: RBH-TRB 81 MARKET, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv16789
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/8/2019. (kd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by RBH-TRB 81 MARKET, LLC.(ZAMMATORE, THOMAS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE CO.. RBH-TRB 81 MARKET, LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RBH-TRB 81 MARKET, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
August 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RBH-TRB 81 MARKET, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9899062) with JURY DEMAND, filed by UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE CO. v. RBH-TRB 81 MARKET, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBH-TRB 81 MARKET, LLC
Represented By: THOMAS A ZAMMATORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: MICHAEL DILLON O'DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?