ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC v. LJS WATERPROOFING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC
Defendant: LJS WATERPROOFING, LLC, LEWIS KERMAN, JOHN BIERMAN and SCOTT LAUBSHIRE
Case Number: 2:2019cv16805
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE.***LJS WATERPROOFING, LLC, JOHN BIERMAN and LEWIS KERMAN terminated.. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/9/2019. (vm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants LJS Waterproofing, LLC, John Bierman, and Lewis Kerman by ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC. (MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Plainitff's Counsel. (MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Defendants' Attorney. (JONES, ROBERT)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Alchemy Spetec, LLC's motion for entry of default (ECF No. #13 ) is administratively terminated. Alchemy Spetec, LLC may file a letter requesting to enter default, if appropriate, once this Court has determined that complete diversity of citizenship exists between the parties, and thus, that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction. The parties are directed to comply with this Court's September 26, 2019 Order. See ECF No. 12. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/4/2019. (as, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Scott Laubshire by ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC. (MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
October 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee, as to, Steven Jacob Carroll: $ 150, receipt number NEW040668 (vm )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The information provided concerning Alchemy Spetec, LLC and LJS Waterproofing, LLC is insufficient to determine if complete diversity of citizenship exists between the parties, and thus, whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction. On or before October 7, 2019 at 5 PM, both Alchemy Spetec, LLC and LJS Waterproofing, LLC, shall file letters specifically naming and describing each of their members and the citizenship of each of those members. Furthermore, if any member of Alchemy Spetec, LLC or LJS Waterproofing, LLC is itself a limited liability company, partnership, or other unincorporated entity, then the members of that entity will also need to be identified and analyzed completely. See VICI Racing, LLC v. T-Mobile USA, Inc., 763 F. 3d 273 (3d Cir. 2014). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/26/2019. (as, )
September 25, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by JOHN BIERMAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/9/2019. (vm )
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant John Bierman. Attorney ROBERT ALAN JONES for JOHN BIERMAN,ROBERT ALAN JONES for LEWIS KERMAN,ROBERT ALAN JONES for LJS WATERPROOFING, LLC added. (JONES, ROBERT)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, as to Steven Jacob Carroll, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/20/2019. (vm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION by ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC. (MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC. (MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Steven Jacob Carroll to Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC. (MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
September 11, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The certification of Steven Jacob Carroll in the motion to be admitted for Pro Hac Vice submitted by COURTNEY K. MAZZIO, on 9/10/2019 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (vm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Declaration Declaration, #3 Certification Certification)(MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC. JOHN BIERMAN served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC. SCOTT LAUBSHIRE served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC. LEWIS KERMAN served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; LJS WATERPROOFING, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (MAZZIO, COURTNEY)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN BIERMAN, LEWIS KERMAN, SCOTT LAUBSHIRE, LJS WATERPROOFING, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
August 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Bierman, Lewis Kerman, LJS Waterproofing, LLC, Scott Laubshire ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9899929) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Alchemy Spetec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(MAZZIO, COURTNEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC v. LJS WATERPROOFING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALCHEMY SPETEC, LLC
Represented By: COURTNEY KELLYN MAZZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJS WATERPROOFING, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT ALAN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS KERMAN
Represented By: ROBERT ALAN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BIERMAN
Represented By: ROBERT ALAN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LAUBSHIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?