ARAIZ v. RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP et al
Plaintiff: DESIREE ARAIZ
Defendant: OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP and RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv16870
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CAMERON ALEXANDER SMITH on behalf of OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC (SMITH, CAMERON)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ALNISA S. BELL on behalf of OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC (BELL, ALNISA)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by YINAN MA on behalf of DESIREE ARAIZ (MA, YINAN)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA W. CLARK on behalf of DESIREE ARAIZ (CLARK, JULIA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DESIREE ARAIZ. OPTUM, INC. waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019; RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019; RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (KARPF, ARI)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
August 19, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (eu, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9902966) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DESIREE ARAIZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARAIZ v. RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM, INC.
Represented By: ALNISA S. BELL
Represented By: CAMERON ALEXANDER SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP
Represented By: ALNISA S. BELL
Represented By: CAMERON ALEXANDER SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: ALNISA S. BELL
Represented By: CAMERON ALEXANDER SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESIREE ARAIZ
Represented By: ARI R. KARPF
Represented By: YINAN MA
Represented By: JULIA W. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?