EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION v. AMERICAN TRADING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Plaintiff: EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION
Defendant: AMERICAN TRADING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv16874
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer the Complaint re #6 Stipulation. The time for Defendant to answer the Complaint is extended to 10/24/2019. etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/15/2019. (dam, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION. (STEINBERG, RICK)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER-ORDER ORIGINAL FILED WITH THE CLERK OF COURT. You are hereby directed to move this civil action, by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to answer out of time, within twenty (20) days from the date hereof. etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/24/2019. (dam, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION. AMERICAN TRADING INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (STEINBERG, RICK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN TRADING INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
August 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (eu, )
August 20, 2019 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION identifying Evergreen Marine Corp. (Taiwan) Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN TRADING INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9903103), filed by EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STEINBERG, RICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION v. AMERICAN TRADING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION
Represented By: RICK A. STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN TRADING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?