Krasniqi et al v. Velarde et al
Plaintiff: Mrika Krasniqi and Anil Zogjani
Defendant: ACTING SECRETARY DHS KEVIN K MCALEENAN, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, Chief Barbara Velarde and Acting Director Kenneth T. "Ken" Cuccinelli II
Case Number: 2:2019cv16909
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Judge Kevin McNulty added. (eu, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06727. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2019 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #9 Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (ne)
August 12, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey (ne)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Because Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate that venue is proper in the Southern District of New York, and because Plaintiffs appear to reside in New Jersey, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey where venue is proper pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1391(e)(1)(C). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/12/2019) (ne) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #4 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Mrika Krasniqi, Anil Zogjani. (De Graaf, Kai)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mrika Krasniqi, Anil Zogjani.(De Graaf, Kai)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (De Graaf, Kai)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. "Ken" Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, Gregory A. Richardson, Barbara Velarde. Document filed by Mrika Krasniqi, Anil Zogjani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART I, #2 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART II, #3 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART III, #4 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART IV, #5 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART V, #6 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART VI, #7 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART VII, #8 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART VIII, #9 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART IX, #10 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBIT PART X, #11 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART XI, #12 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART XII)(De Graaf, Kai)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiffs to show cause in writing, by August 8, 2019, why the action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1391. If Plaintiffs fail to respond within the time allowed or fail to show that venue is proper in the Southern District of New York, the Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/25/2019) (cf)
July 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kai William De Graaf. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mrika Krasniqi; Anil Zogjani; Barbara Velarde; Kenneth T. "Ken" Cuccinelli II; Kevin K. McAleenan; Gregory A. Richardson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kai William De Graaf. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:702; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 08:1101; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kai William De Graaf to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MRIKA KRASNIQI, ANIL ZOGJANI.(De Graaf, Kai)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (De Graaf, Kai)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against KENNETH T CUCCINELLI II, Kevin K. McAleenan, Gregory A. Richardson, Barbara Velarde. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17273798)Document filed by MRIKA KRASNIQI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART I, #2 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART II, #3 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART III, #4 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART IV, #5 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART V, #6 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART VI, #7 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART VII, #8 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART VIII, #9 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART IX, #10 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART X, #11 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART XI, #12 Exhibit COMPLAINT EXHIBITS PART XII)(De Graaf, Kai) Modified on 7/22/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krasniqi et al v. Velarde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrika Krasniqi
Represented By: Kai William De Graaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anil Zogjani
Represented By: Kai William De Graaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTING SECRETARY DHS KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY A. RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Barbara Velarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. "Ken" Cuccinelli II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?