Golding v. Barr
Petitioner: Karim Golding
Respondent: THOMAS DECKER and Attorney General WILLIAM BARR
Case Number: 2:2019cv16977
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-05239. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey (rj)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY TRANSFER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action shall be and hereby is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, and that the seven-day waiting period in Local Civil Rule 83.1 is waived. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/16/2019) (rj)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker. (Kahane, Joshua)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Received returned mail re: #12 Order Set Deadlines. Mail was addressed to Karim Golding of LaSalle Detention Facility at 830 Pine Hill Road, Jena, LA 71342 and was returned for the following reason(s): R.T.S. - Attempted-Not Known. (mfm) Modified on 8/13/2019 (kgo).
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 PRO SE MEMORANDUM(Notice of Change of Address) dated 8/1/19 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Karim Golding. New Address: 827 Forrest Ave., Gadsden, Alabama, 35901. (sc)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by Karim Golding. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. The parties are directed to submit a proposed stipulation and order to transfer venue by August 16, 2019. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/9/2019) (jca) Modified on 8/9/2019 (jca).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL granting #13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Karim T Golding PRO SE, New Attorney: John Leschak with Letter Request to Transfer Venue to the District of New Jersey. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that John P. Leschak, Esq., is hereby entered as the Attorney of Record for Petitioner, Karim T.G. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/9/2019) (jca)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from John Leschak dated 08/08/2019 re: Agreement to Transfer Case to District of New Jersey. Document filed by Karim Golding. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Leschak, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Karim T Golding PRO SE, New Attorney: John Leschak with Letter Request to Transfer Venue to the District of New Jersey. Document filed by Karim Golding. Return Date set for 9/3/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Leschak, John)
July 22, 2019 Mailed a copy of #12 Order, Set Deadlines, to Karim Golding A206552755 LaSalle Detention Facility 830 Pine Hill Road Jena, LA 71342. (vba)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Petitioner shall file any amended petition by August 9, 2019. It is unlikely that Petitioner will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended petition is filed, Petitioner shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by August 18, 2019. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served by September 1, 2019. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Petitioner. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/22/2019) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss/Transfer served on Karim Golding on 7/19/19. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker. (Kahane, Joshua)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Deportation Officer Mario A. Garaffa in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey.. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker. (Kahane, Joshua)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey. . Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker. (Kahane, Joshua)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss ., MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker.(Kahane, Joshua)
July 18, 2019 Mailed a copy of #7 Order, #5 Information Package - Mailed, #4 Order to Answer, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Karim Golding A206552755 LaSalle Detention Facility 830 Pine Hill Road Jena, LA 71342. (nb)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail the Habeas Information Package, including this Court's Order to Answer (Doc. 4), to the petitioner at: Karim Golding, A206552755, LaSalle Detention Facility, 830 Pine Hill Road, Jena, LA 71342. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to update the docket with petitioner's current address as listed above. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/18/2019) (rro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
July 12, 2019 Received returned mail Mail was addressed to Karim Golding, Essex County Jail 324 Doremus Avenue Newark, NJ 07105 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender; Unable to Forward; RTS Not Here. (Persaud, Anisa)
July 1, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order to Answer, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York United States Attorney's Office SDNY 86 Chambers St. New York, NY 10007 by Certified Mail # 7017 2680 0000 1025 4571. (nb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Evan Kahane on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Decker. (Kahane, Joshua)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 HABEAS INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Karim Golding A206552755 Essex County Jail 324 Doremus Avenue Newark, NJ 07105, at, on 6/19/2019 Re: #4 Order to Answer. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER: The Court, having reviewed the petition filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, hereby ORDERS the following: The Government's return to the petition, including a memorandum of law, shall be filed by July 19, 2019; and Petitioner's reply, if any, shall be filed by August 19, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court serve copies of this Order, the petition, and all other papers in support thereof, by certified mail upon the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (William Barr answer due 7/12/2019; Thomas Decker answer due 7/12/2019. Replies due by 8/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/19/2019) (rro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
June 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac)
June 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF PRO SE filed. (sac)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number 465401236737) Document filed by Karim Golding. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golding v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THOMAS DECKER
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karim Golding
Represented By: John Peter Leschak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?