Jilek et al v. Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Jilek and LaTorrie Glover-Brown
Defendant: RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR'S BUREAU, INC., OPTUM360 LLC, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS and QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv16983
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 8/20/19 from the Southern District of New York 7:19-cv-05552 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 20, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05552. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/9/2019) (sjo)
August 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 16, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:19-cv-05210-NSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID M. BERGER granting #8 Motion for David M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 8. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/31/2019) (rj)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF Eric H. Gibbs granting #7 Motion for Eric H. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice.The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 7. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/31/2019) (rj)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT STIPULATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING ON CONSOLIDATION AND TRANSFER BY JPML: IT IS THEREFORE STIPULATED AND AGREED by the Stipulating Parties, through their respective counsel of record, that they jointly stipulate and request that the Court stay this matter in its entirety, including but not limited to (1) all scheduling deadlines pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and this Honorable Court, (2) discovery, and (3) the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, pending a ruling by the JPML concerning the transfer of this action for inclusion in MDL No. 2904 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. The Stipulating Parties further stipulate and agree, with the Court's approval, that the stay will automatically terminate seven (7) days after any decision denying transfer by the JPML. The Stipulating Parties further stipulate and agree that nothing in this stay shall prejudice Plaintiffs should they need to seek emergency relief. If Plaintiffs need to seek emergency relief, Plaintiffs agree to meet and confer with Defendants before filing any application for emergency relief. Nothing herein shall be deemed a waiver of any rights or defenses by the Stipulating Parties except as set forth herein. This stipulation may be executed in counter parts, including by signature transmitted by facsimile. The Clerk of the Court is directed to stay this case., Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/31/2019) (rj)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Quest Diagnostics Inc.. Document filed by Quest Diagnostics Inc..(Joyce, Eamon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pouneh Aravand on behalf of Quest Diagnostics Inc.. (Aravand, Pouneh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eamon Paul Joyce on behalf of Quest Diagnostics Inc.. (Joyce, Eamon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Optum360 LLC. (Seligmann, Reade)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate UnitedHealthcare Services, Inc., Other Affiliate OptumInsight Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Optum Rocket Inc, Other Affiliate OptumInsight Inc., Other Affiliate Optum, Inc. for Optum360 LLC. Document filed by Optum360 LLC.(Seligmann, Reade)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reade William Seligmann on behalf of Optum360 LLC. (Seligmann, Reade)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Kisloff, Michelle)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Anne Kisloff on behalf of Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, Optum360 LLC, Quest Diagnostics Inc., Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (dnh)
July 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Eric H. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #8 MOTION for David M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITORS BUREAU, INC. D/B/A AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY; QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, INC.; OPTUM360, LLC; AND LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS D/B/A LABCORP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by LaTorrie Glover-Brown, Ashley Jilek. (Kehoe, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for David M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LaTorrie Glover-Brown, Ashley Jilek. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David M. Berger, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kehoe, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Eric H. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LaTorrie Glover-Brown, Ashley Jilek. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric H. Gibbs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kehoe, John)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Anthony Kehoe to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the plaintiff party text in the caption on the summons PDF contains a typographical error. Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party name. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITORS BUREAU, INC. D/B/A AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY; QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, INC.; OPTUM360, LLC; AND LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS D/B/A LABCORP;, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by LaTorrie Glover-Brown, Ashley Jilek. (Kehoe, John) Modified on 7/1/2019 (dnh).
June 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #5 MOTION for Eric H. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17139591. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Eric H. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17139591. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LaTorrie Glover-Brown, Ashley Jilek. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric H. Gibbs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric) Modified on 6/26/2019 (wb).
June 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for David M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138599. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the certificate of good standing must be issued by the Supreme Court of California and also attach the proposed order. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ma)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for David M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138599. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LaTorrie Glover-Brown, Ashley Jilek. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David M. Berger)(Berger, David) Modified on 6/25/2019 (ma).
June 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 19-cv-5210. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Anthony Kehoe. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ashley Jilek; LaTorrie Glover-Brown; Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Anthony Kehoe. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State);. (jgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-05210 (NSR). Document filed by LaTorrie Glover-Brown, Ashley Jilek.(Kehoe, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kehoe, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laboratory Corporation of America, Optum360 LLC, Quest Diagnostics Inc., Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17081619)Document filed by Ashley Jilek, LaTorrie Glover-Brown.(Kehoe, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jilek et al v. Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR'S BUREAU, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 LLC
Represented By: READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Represented By: Michelle Anne Kisloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC
Represented By: Eamon Paul Joyce
Represented By: Pouneh Aravand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Jilek
Represented By: John Anthony Kehoe
Represented By: ERIC H. GIBBS
Represented By: David Berger
Represented By: DAVID M. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTorrie Glover-Brown
Represented By: John Anthony Kehoe
Represented By: ERIC H. GIBBS
Represented By: David Berger
Represented By: DAVID M. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?