Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Yoo, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Richard Braver, D.P.M., Star Health Management, L.L.C., Daniel J. Yoo, M.D., HACKENSACK SURGERY CENTER, LLC., Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C. and Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M.
Case Number: 2:2019cv16996
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct to Reopen the Deadline to Amend Pleadings and for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (byl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, Government Employees Insurance Company re #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct to Reopen the Deadline to Amend Pleadings and for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang)(KANG, GENE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 11, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Amend/Correct to Reopen the Deadline to Amend Pleadings and for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting #66 Application for the admission pro hac vice of Barry I. Levey and Max Gershenoff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/4/2019. (byl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 66 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Barry I. Levy and Max Gershenoff for by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gene Y. Kang, #2 Certification of Barry I. Levy, #3 Certification of Max Gershenoff, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ORDER - In light of the recent transfer to the undersigned, each party shall submit directly to Chambers via fax, by September 12th, a confidential letter not to exceed three (3) pages in length, addressing the status of the case, pending motions, settlement and procedural issues. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/29/19. (jl, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 64 Letter re #63 Letter. (WEISBROT, N.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 63 Letter from Geico to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #60 Letter. (KANG, GENE)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an In-Person Status conference on 9/24/19 at 11am before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D. Please contact chambers at (973) 776 7862 with any questions or concerns. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/27/19. (tjg, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by GENE Y. KANG on behalf of GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, Government Employees Insurance Company (KANG, GENE)
August 26, 2019 Filing 60 Letter from Nathaniel A Weisbrot. (WEISBROT, N.)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/26/2019. (byl)
August 22, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (eu, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 58 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05735. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION *** This action is transferred to the District of New Jersey. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 8/8/2019. (Arber, Jacob)
August 2, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY in Support of Order to Show Cause filed by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Weisbrot, Nathanial)
August 2, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Danielle Perdomo) (Gershenoff, Max)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE *** Under the circumstances, it appears that transfer of this action to the District of New Jersey would serve the interests of justice. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). I may sua sponte transfer an action under 1404(a) after giving both parties notice and an opportunity to be heard. See Lead Indus. Ass'n, Inc. v. Occupational Safety & Health Admin., 610 F.2d 70, 79 n.17 (2d Cir. 1979). See generally Wright & Miller, Federal Practice and Procedure 3844 (4th ed. 2013). Accordingly, the parties are ordered to address the advisability of transfer to the District of New Jersey no later than 8/2/2019. Because the overlapping issues of venue and personal jurisdiction have already been fully briefed, the parties shall limit their submissions to 7 pages. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 7/26/2019. (Yanni, Stephen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal filed by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Weisbrot, Nathanial)
July 22, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY in Support re #50 First MOTION for Discovery and to Quash Subpoena filed by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Weisbrot, Nathanial)
July 22, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Motion with accompanying exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Protective Order) (Gorton, Sean)
July 22, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Protective Order) (Gorton, Sean)
July 21, 2019 Filing 50 First MOTION for Discovery and to Quash Subpoena by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Weisbrot, Nathanial)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person status conference will be held on 9/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/12/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time #47 is granted. The discovery deadlines are hereby extended as follows: (1) the deadline to complete fact discovery is 11/15/2019; (2) expert reports must be exchanged by 12/15/2019; (3) expert depositions must be completed by 1/15/2020; (4) all discovery must be completed by 1/15/2020; and (5) the deadline to take the first step in dispositive motion practice is 2/15/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/12/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY in Support re #47 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Reply in Further Support of Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Existing Case Management Deadlines filed by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Gorton, Sean)
July 11, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
July 11, 2019 Filing 47 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Gorton, Sean)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to withdraw and for extension of time #31 is granted. The motion to dismiss by Hackensack Defendants #20 is hereby terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/11/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The proposed Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs, docket entry #45 , is so ordered. To the extent that any portion of the stipulation is inconsistent with this Court's procedures for sealing documents or the standards governing the ability of this Court to permit the sealing of documents, the Court's practices and standards shall be followed by the parties and will govern any dispute. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/22/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 45 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order) (Gorton, Sean)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for protective order #44 is denied without prejudice. Parties should re-submit a clean copy of the proposed order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/18/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
April 17, 2019 Filing 44 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order) (Gorton, Sean)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants Richard Braver, Hackensack Surgery, LLC, and Star Health Management LLC ("Hackensack Surgery Defendants") have moved to quash a subpoena directed to their bank for bank records relating to Hackensack Surgery, LLC. The motion to quash #42 is denied. The Hackensack Surgery Defendants raise three basic arguments in support of their motion. The arguments are without merit. First, they argue that Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate that the documents are relevant to their case. Plaintiffs have alleged in their Complaint that the Hackensack Surgery was involved in a no-fault insurance fraud scheme, and its bank records contain pertinent evidence of potential kickbacks and illegal payments. The records sought are pertinent and relevant to such no-fault insurance fraud and RICO claims brought against medical providers, as a legion of Courts have repeatedly found. See, e.g., Allstate Ins. Co. v. Elzanaty, No. 11-CV-3862, 2012 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 171962, at *4 (E.D.N.Y. Dec. 4, 2012); Gov't Emps. Ins. Co. v. Lenex Servs., No. 16-CV-6030, 2018 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 43584, at *31 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 15, 2018). Second, they argue that the subpoena is overbroad because it seeks records for a nine-year period. But the claims of RICO and fraud involving these Defendants is alleged to have begun in 2010, and continued until at least the filing of the Complaint. As a result, the scope of the subpoena is appropriate. Finally, they state that the discovery is obtainable from other sources. This assertion is made only in the most general way, and alludes to the documents in Geico's possession. The availability of documents through alternative sources could be a basis to limit discovery; however, these Defendants do not establish that the bank and payment information is in GEICO's possession, and there is good reason to believe such information is not. The documents sought would not have been regularly provided to GEICO in connection with filing of no-fault insurance claims, and the internal movement of money from one entity to another and alleged kickback payments would not necessarily be evident from GEICO's own records. In any event, without more of a showing from the Hackensack Surgery Defendants that the documents are already the subject of discovery, GEICO is entitled to use a subpoena to obtain the documents from a third party. The motion to quash is denied. The documents can only be produced if they are subject to a protective order limiting their disclosure and use. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/11/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
April 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: An in-person settlement conference was held on 4/8/2019. Counsel for all parties were present. A settlement was not reached. (FTR Log #10:45-10:47.) (Murphy, Colleen)
March 11, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gershenoff, Max)
March 8, 2019 Filing 42 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
March 7, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY in Support re #39 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
March 7, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #39 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Behalf of Plaintiffs filed by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Max Gershenoff, #2 Declaration Danielle Perdomo) (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
March 7, 2019 Filing 39 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration) (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
January 28, 2019 Filing 38 Letter For Motion to Dismiss by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENDORSED ORDER ON DOCUMENT #[19-2], granting Consent Order and Injunction. (Must See Order for further details) Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 12/19/18. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated Dec. 10, 2018) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER ON DOCUMENT #[19-1], granting #19 Motion to Stay. Yoo and Western Janeda's time to respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including December 20, 2018; and Plaintiffs, Yoo, and Western Janeda consent to, and jointly respectfully move the Court for, entry of the Order and Injunction in the form attached hereto as Exhibit "A". (Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 12/11/18) (Attachments: #1 Letter dated Dec. 10, 2018) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 22, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint, , First CROSSCLAIM against Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C. by Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C., Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M., Daniel J. Yoo, M.D.. (Roberts, Keith)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint certification that discovery has been completed by 10/15/2019. Other deadlines set based on parties' submitted joint discovery worksheet and are reflected in the attached order. An in-person settlement conference will be held on 4/08/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All parties must be present. Parties are to submit their respective ex parte settlement positions via Chambers email no later than three days before 4/08/2019. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference, which is available on the Courts website. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/11/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
January 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: An in person initial conference was held on 1/11/2019. All parties were present. (See separate docket entry for orders issuing from this proceeding.) (FTR Log #3:16-3:26.) (Manson, Eddie)
January 9, 2019 Filing 33 Letter in response to Discovery Plan by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
January 9, 2019 Filing 32 Letter Covering Proposed Scheduling Order by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Discovery Plan Worksheet) (Gershenoff, Max)
January 8, 2019 Filing 31 Consent MOTION to Withdraw , without prejudice, the motion to dismiss addressed to the original complaint in this action, and for an extension of Defendants Richard Braver, D.P.M., Star Health Management, L.L.C., and Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C.s time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gorton, Sean)
January 8, 2019 Filing 30 Letter In Response by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
January 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Roberts on behalf of Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M., Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C., Daniel J. Yoo, M.D. (notification declined or already on case) (Roberts, Keith)
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 Letter in Reply to Letter Regarding Discovery Schedule (Docket No. 25) by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Gershenoff, Max)
January 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Bezas on behalf of Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Bezas, Christina)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion of Keith J. Roberts for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #23 is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/8/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY in Support re #23 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11077539. Consent Stipulation and Order filed by Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M., Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C., Daniel J. Yoo, M.D.. (Roberts, Keith)
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 Letter Regarding Discovery Schedule by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the in person initial conference scheduled for 1/11/2019 at 10:30 A.M. will now be held at 2:30 P.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet #12 and electronically file same with the Court no later than two day before 1/11/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/7/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C., Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M., Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C., Daniel J. Yoo, M.D., filed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-a, #3 Exhibit 2) (Gershenoff, Max)
January 7, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11077539. by Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M., Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C., Daniel J. Yoo, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (Roberts, Keith)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time #22 is granted. Gregory S. Tamagnini, Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, and Daniel J. Yoo must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 1/15/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/28/2018. (Murphy, Colleen)
December 26, 2018 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M., Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C., Daniel J. Yoo, M.D.. (Kasolas, Haralampo)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 Letter For Motion to Dismiss by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration) (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
December 11, 2018 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Stay Pending No-Fault Insurance Collection Arbitrations Pending the Disposition of This Action, Consent MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Enjoin No-Fault Collection Arbitrations Pending the Disposition of This Action by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, part one - So-Ordered Stipulation, #2 Exhibit 2, part two - Proposed Consent Order) (Gershenoff, Max)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time #18 is granted. Defendants Richard Braver, Hackensack Surgery Center, and Star Health Management must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 12/20/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/27/2018. (Murphy, Colleen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C.. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time #17 is granted. Defendants Gregory S. Tamagnini, Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, and Daniel J. Yoo must respond to the complaint by 12/7/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/26/2018. (Murphy, Colleen)
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M., Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C., Daniel J. Yoo, M.D.. (Kasolas, Haralampo)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION by Richard Braver, D.P.M., Star Health Management, L.L.C. (Weisbrot, N. Ari)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Richard Braver, D.P.M. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Gorton, Sean)
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C. served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (Gorton, Sean)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on 1/11/2019 at 10:30 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff counsel is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time Defendant makes an appearance within this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 1/11/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/29/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Gorton, Sean)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Star Health Management, L.L.C. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Gorton, Sean)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Gorton, Sean)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Daniel J. Yoo, M.D. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Gorton, Sean)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/16/2018. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/16/2018. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 15, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Edward R. Korman and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Saulter Gershenoff on behalf of Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Gershenoff, Max)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Gorton, Sean)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Braver, D.P.M., Hackensack Surgery Center, L.L.C., Star Health Management, L.L.C., Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M., Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C., Daniel J. Yoo, M.D. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10833297 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons & Rider, #3 Exhibit 1a, #4 Exhibit 1b, #5 Exhibit 2) (Gorton, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Yoo, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Braver, D.P.M.
Represented By: Nathanial A. Weisbrot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Health Management, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nathanial A. Weisbrot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Yoo, M.D.
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Represented By: Haralampo Kasolas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HACKENSACK SURGERY CENTER, LLC.
Represented By: Nathanial A. Weisbrot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Janeda Orthopedics of New Jersey, L.L.C.
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Represented By: Haralampo Kasolas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory S. Tamagnini, D.P.M.
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Represented By: Haralampo Kasolas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Represented By: Christina M Bezas
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Represented By: Christina M Bezas
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Represented By: Christina M Bezas
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Represented By: Christina M Bezas
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?