Villarreal et al v. American Medical Collection Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Grossman, Karina Gras and Rosa Villarreal
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS and AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv17037
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 8/22/19 from the Southern District of New York 7:19-cv-05340 for MDL 2789 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 22, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05340. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/9/2019) (sjo)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Defendant must answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 3, 2019. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, agree that should the Related Actions not be consolidated into an MDL and should LabCorp respond to a complaint in another Related Action that LabCorp will likewise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on the same day. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings answer due 9/3/2019. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/8/2019) (mro)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Kisloff, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Anne Kisloff on behalf of Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. American Medical Collection Agency, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service was accepted by Ericka Almonte - Authorized Employee. Document filed by Rosa Villarreal; Jeffrey Grossman; Karina Gras. (Seeger, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service was accepted by Janice Parker - Authorized Employee. Document filed by Rosa Villarreal; Jeffrey Grossman; Karina Gras. (Seeger, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (dnh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Parvin Kristy Aminolroaya on behalf of Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, Rosa Villarreal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Aminolroaya, Parvin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Adam Seeger on behalf of Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, Rosa Villarreal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Seeger, Christopher)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., and Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, Rosa Villarreal. (Seeger, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
June 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
June 11, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:19-cv-05302-VB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
June 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vincent L. Briccetti as possibly related to 7:19cv5302. (sj)
June 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:19-cv-05302. Document filed by Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, Rosa Villarreal.(Seeger, Christopher)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Seeger, Christopher)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17036647)Document filed by Rosa Villarreal, Jeffrey Grossman, Karina Gras.(Seeger, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villarreal et al v. American Medical Collection Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Represented By: Michelle Anne Kisloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Grossman
Represented By: PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Gras
Represented By: PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Villarreal
Represented By: PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?