ROUSSEAU v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: BRUCE ROUSSEAU and 3M COMPANY
Defendant: MICHAEL F ROMAN, INGE G THULIN and NICHOLAS C GANGESTAD
Petitioner: IRON WORKERS LOCAL 580 JOINT FUNDS, FLOSSBACH VON STORCH INVEST S.A., Sjunde AP-Fonden, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, OFFICE OF THE RHODE ISLAND TREASURER ON BEHALF OF THE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND and MP Investment Management A/S
Case Number: 2:2019cv17090
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF INSTITUTIONAL INVESTORS FOR CONSOLIDATION OF THE RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL: Docket Nos. 2:19-cv-15982 and 2:19-cv-17090 are hereby consolidated as In re 3M Company Securities Litigation 19-15982 as master file for every action in the consolidated action. The Clerk shall administratively close the other action, etc.; the Institutional Investors are Appointed to serve as Lead Plaintiff; the Institutional Investors' selection of Lead Counsel is Approved and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Motley Rice LLC are Appointed to serve as Lead Counsel, etc.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/21/2019. (sm)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Seeger Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jl, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by MP Investment Management A/S, Sjunde AP-Fonden re #5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Notice of Non-Opposition of Sjunde AP-Fonden and MP Investment Management A/S (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
September 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel, #5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Sjunde AP-Fonden, MP Investment Management A/S. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph J. DePalma, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, OFFICE OF THE RHODE ISLAND TREASURER ON BEHALF OF THE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, IRON WORKERS LOCAL 580 JOINT FUNDS, FLOSSBACH VON STORCH INVEST S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Christopher A. Seeger, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3M COMPANY, NICHOLAS C GANGESTAD, MICHAEL F ROMAN, INGE G THULIN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
August 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by BRUCE ROUSSEAU as to 3M COMPANY, NICHOLAS C GANGESTAD, MICHAEL F ROMAN, INGE G THULIN. (LINDENFELD, JONATHAN)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, NICHOLAS C GANGESTAD, MICHAEL F ROMAN, INGE G THULIN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913679) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRUCE ROUSSEAU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LINDENFELD, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROUSSEAU v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL F ROMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGE G THULIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS C GANGESTAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE ROUSSEAU
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID LINDENFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: IRON WORKERS LOCAL 580 JOINT FUNDS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FLOSSBACH VON STORCH INVEST S.A.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sjunde AP-Fonden
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, OFFICE OF THE RHODE ISLAND TREASURER ON BEHALF OF THE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MP Investment Management A/S
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?