Hayhurst et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Plaintiff: Amanda Hayhurst and Donnetta Huffman
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Case Number: 2:2019cv17163
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00590. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the District of New Jersey transferring this action to the USDC/NJ for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/22/2019. (Attachment: #1 Request Letter from USDC/NJ) (cc: attys) (kew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3), MDL 2904. (kew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/15/2019 as to Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002568754. (msa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia M. Kipnis on behalf of Amanda Hayhurst, Donnetta Huffman. (Kipnis, Patricia)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan R. Marshall on behalf of Amanda Hayhurst, Donnetta Huffman. (Marshall, Jonathan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin L. Bailey on behalf of Amanda Hayhurst, Donnetta Huffman. (Bailey, Benjamin)
August 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (slr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7347047. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayhurst et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hayhurst
Represented By: Jonathan R. Marshall
Represented By: Ruperto Yongque Dumapit
Represented By: Patricia M. Kipnis
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Steven R. Broadwater, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnetta Huffman
Represented By: Jonathan R. Marshall
Represented By: Ruperto Yongque Dumapit
Represented By: Patricia M. Kipnis
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Steven R. Broadwater, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?