Hough et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: JASON HOUGH and BRITTANY ANN HOUGH
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, UNKNOWN PARTIES and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv17792
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Brown; that counsel shall make payments to the New Jersey Lawyers Fund for Client Protection and shall pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, etc. igned by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/8/2019. (sm)
October 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Matthew E. Brown, Esq.). Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
October 23, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Matthew E. Brown, Esq.) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David J. Cooner, Esq., #2 Certification of Matthew E. Brown, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(COONER, DAVID)
September 19, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH KATHERINE MONAHAN on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (MONAHAN, ELIZABETH)
September 10, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (dm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 33 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:15-cv-01690. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 5, 2019 Remark: Case Remanded to the District of New Jersey. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 4, 2019 Filing 32 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (FINAL). ORDERED that the Action(s) on this Conditional Remand Order be Remanded to its/their Respective Transferor Court(s). See Order for Details. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #29 , #30 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #29 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/23/19. (MAP)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
August 26, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE that CV-15-1690-PHX-DGC (formerly District of New Jersey 2:15-cv-1892) is now consolidated with and part of MDL No. 2641. Therefore, future pleadings pertaining to the above case will be filed in MDL-No. 2641. (MAP)
August 26, 2015 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:15-cv-01892 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Arizona. (jl, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/12/15. (cm) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
August 3, 2015 Filing 24 Letter from Gary R. Tulp, Esq. to Judge Hammer Re: Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Discovery Confidentiality Order), #2 Certification of Matthew E. Brown)(TULP, GARY) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
July 7, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAMES F. ROGERS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (cm ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
July 7, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, RICHARD B. NORTH, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (cm ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
July 7, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MATTHEW E. BROWN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (cm ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
July 7, 2015 Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James F. Rogers, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
July 7, 2015 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Richard B. North, Jr., Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
July 7, 2015 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew E. Brown, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
July 6, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/6/2015. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/20/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2015. Fact Discovery due by 4/18/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 8/3/2015, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/6/15. (cm) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 450, receipt number NEW026530 RE: Matthew E. Brown, Richard B. North, Jr., James F. Rogers. (sr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 29, 2015 Filing 19 Joint Discovery Plan by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC..(TULP, GARY) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; as to MATTHEW E. BROWN, ESQ., granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; as to RICHARD B. NORTH, JR. ESQ., granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; as to JAMES F. ROGERS, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/25/15. (cm ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for ANDRES F. ALONSO, ESQ. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/23/15. (cm ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 23, 2015 Filing 16 Certification of (Amended Certification) of David J. Cooner in support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of James F. Rogers, Esq. on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. Re #11 Motion for Leave to Appear,. (COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 23, 2015 Filing 15 Certification of (Amended Certification) of David J. Cooner in support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Richard B. North, Jr., Esq. on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. Re #10 Motion for Leave to Appear,. (COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 23, 2015 Filing 14 Certification of (Amended Certification) of David J. Cooner in support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew E. Brown, Esq. on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. Re #9 Motion for Leave to Appear,. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Hammer)(COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 19, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andres F. Alonso Esq.. Motion set for 7/20/2015 before Judge Madeline C. Arleo. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (sr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 19, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andres F. Alonso Esq. by BRITTANY ANN HOUGH, JASON HOUGH. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Cover Letter)(KRANGLE, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 17, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY ROBERT TULP on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. (TULP, GARY) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 15, 2015 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (James F. Rogers, Esq.) by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David J. Cooner, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of James F. Rogers, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Letter to Judge Hammer)(COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 15, 2015 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Richard B. North, Jr.) by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David J. Cooner, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Richard B. North, Jr., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Letter to Judge Hammer)(COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 15, 2015 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Matthew E. Brown, Esq.) by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David J. Cooner, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew E. Brown, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Letter to Judge Hammer)(COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference shall proceed on 7/6/2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Parties must electronically file the joint discovery plan by 7/2/2015. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/3/2015. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
June 1, 2015 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRITTANY ANN HOUGH, JASON HOUGH. BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. served on 4/27/2015, answer due 5/18/2015. (KRANGLE, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
May 29, 2015 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark no longer assigned to the case. (in-tk, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER - Setting an Initial Conference for 7/6/2015 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/18/2015. (mw, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
May 13, 2015 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. identifying N/A as Corporate Parent.. (COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
May 13, 2015 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk)(COONER, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRITTANY ANN HOUGH, JASON HOUGH. C.R. BARD, INC. served on 4/22/2015, answer due 5/13/2015. (KRANGLE, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
March 16, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *ANGELICA RICHARDSON* (anr) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]
March 13, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC., DOES 1 THROUGH 100 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6269519) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRITTANY ANN HOUGH, JASON HOUGH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to C.R. BARD, INC., #3 Summons as to BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.)(anr) [Transferred from njd on 8/26/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hough et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: GARY ROBERT TULP
Represented By: DAVID J. COONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN PARTIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: GARY ROBERT TULP
Represented By: DAVID J. COONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON HOUGH
Represented By: DAVID B. KRANGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY ANN HOUGH
Represented By: DAVID B. KRANGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?