HESTER v. POWELL
Petitioner: JOEL HESTER
Respondent: JOHN POWELL
Case Number: 2:2019cv17820
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER; re #5 Mr. Hester's request for an extension of time to file a legal memorandum in support of his habeas petition, is granted insofar as described herein; Mr. Hester shall file his legal memorandum in support of his petition no later than January 25, 2020; if Mr. Hester does not file any supporting legal memorandum on or before January 25, 2020, the Court will screen his habeas petition as filed (DE 1), under Rule 4 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases; this order shall not be construed as any determination concerning the timeliness of the habeas petition; the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to Mr. Hester by regular U.S. mail; the Clerk of the Court shall mark this matter as OPEN so that the Court may consider Mr. Hesters request; etc Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/5/2019. (sms)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Petitioner's letter request for a thirty to forty five day extension to file a brief in support of his habeas petition; etc. Filed by Joel Hester. (sms)
October 1, 2019 (Clerk's Note: Mail resent to Mr. Hester. Address information was incomplete). (sms)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joel Hester. (sms)
September 14, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sms)
September 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; granting #2 petitioners motion for an extension of time to file a legal memorandum in support of his habeas petition; petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis, (DE 1-1), is GRANTED; petitioner shall file any legal memorandum in support of his habeas petition no later than December 11, 2019; the Clerk shall administratively terminate this case; case shall be reopened for the purposes of screening under Rule 4 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases when petitioner files a memorandum of law in support of his petition or when his time to do so has expired; and the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to petitioner by regular U.S. mail; etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/12/2019. (sms)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by JOEL HESTER. (jd, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JOEL HESTER. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, # 2 Envelope)(jd, ) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jd, ). Modified on 9/12/2019 (jd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HESTER v. POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOEL HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN POWELL
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?