CASTRO v. DHS-ICE et al
Petitioner: ANTONIO MELQUEZIDETH CASTRO
Respondent: SHERIFF JONATHON HORTON and DHS-ICE
Case Number: 2:2019cv18052
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Northern District of Alabama as case 4:19-cv-01558, filed 09/19/2019. (dm )
September 19, 2019 Case extracted via ECF to Northern District of Alabama. (mfr)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Respondent DHS-ICE is dismissed with prejudice. the sole proper respondent in a petition brought under 28 U.S.C. 2244 is the warden of the facility where the detainee is currently being held, Jonathan Horton; the Clerk shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama; and the Clerk shall serve this Order upon Antonio by regular U.S. mail and shall Close the file. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/18/2019. (sm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW040545.), filed by ANTONIO MELQUEZIDETH CASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 ENVELOPE)(jd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASTRO v. DHS-ICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SHERIFF JONATHON HORTON
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DHS-ICE
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTONIO MELQUEZIDETH CASTRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?