RODRIGUEZ v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: CHARLES RODRIGUEZ and JOSEPH RODRIGUEZ
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv18302
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF Supplemental in Light of United States v. Davis, 139 S.Ct. 2319 (2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Superseding Indictment), #2 Exhibit B (Jury Verdict Sheet))(MCGRAIN, JULIE)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE A. MCGRAIN on behalf of CHARLES RODRIGUEZ (MCGRAIN, JULIE)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Charles Rodriguez (sm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) pursuant to the Johnson Ruling, forwarded to the FPD's Office. In Re to Criminal Case file 98-CR-00547-CCC, filed by CHARLES RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 ORDER)(jd, ) Modified on 9/25/2019 (jd, ). Modified on 9/26/2019 (jr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHARLES RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: JULIE A. MCGRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSEPH RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOHN GAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?