LM INSURANCE CORPORATION v. WB CONTRACTING CORP. et al
Plaintiff: LM INSURANCE CORPORATION
Defendant: VASILIKI APOSTOLOPOULOS, VANA APOSTOPOLIS, VANA APOSTOLOPOULOS, WB CONTRACTING CORP. and VANA POST
Case Number: 2:2019cv18364
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on WB Contracting Corp. on 10/04/2019, filed by LM INSURANCE CORPORATION. (GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against VASILIKI APOSTOLOPOULOS, WB CONTRACTING CORP., filed by LM INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VASILIKI APOSTOLOPOULOS, WB CONTRACTING CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
September 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LM INSURANCE CORPORATION. (GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VASILIKI APOSTOLOPOULOS, WB CONTRACTING CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9990230), filed by LM INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LM INSURANCE CORPORATION v. WB CONTRACTING CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VASILIKI APOSTOLOPOULOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANA APOSTOPOLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANA APOSTOLOPOULOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB CONTRACTING CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANA POST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: ANTHONY J. GOLOWSKI, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?