Veeva Systems Inc. v. IQVIA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Veeva Systems Inc.
Defendant: IMS SOFTWARE SERVICES, LTD. and IQVIA INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv18558
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 63 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-04137. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 27, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the District of New Jersey. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE #40 MOTION TO DISMISS, STAY, OR TRANSFER AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Marlo A. Pecora. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 60 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13722066.) filed by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pecora, Marlo) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Golda Farleigh as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Veeva Systems, Inc. (Farleigh, Jenna) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint filed with leave of Court pursuant to Docket No. 56 byIMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Olson, Steig) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY (re #40 MOTION to Dismiss , Stay, or Transfer ) Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer filed byIMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Olson, Steig) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #52 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER OUT OF TIME by Judge William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing re #40 MOTION to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer previously set for 9/19/2019 08:00 AM is rescheduled to 10/10/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 54 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #40 MOTION to Dismiss , Stay, or Transfer ) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declar of SFB ISO Veeva's Opp to IMS & IQVIA's Mtn to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Benz, Steven) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/29/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2019 Filing 53 Declaration of Marlo A. Pecora in Support of #52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time filed byIMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Related document(s) #52 ) (Olson, Steig) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time filed by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer, #2 Proposed Order)(Olson, Steig) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Stephen A. Swedlow. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Steig D. Olson. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 49 Second MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Stephen A. Swedlow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13628278.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/20/2019 filed by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Swedlow, Stephen) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 48 Second MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Steig D. Olson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13628687.) Filing fee previously paid on 08/20/2019 filed by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Olson, Steig) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Steig D. Olson. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Order) (tlhS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Stephen A. Swedlow. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE #38 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-3 by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 44 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steig Olson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13628687.) filed by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of good standing)(Olson, Steig) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 43 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Stephen A. Swedlow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13628278.) filed by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of good standing)(Swedlow, Stephen) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 42 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint ) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Brightman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Brightman, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2019) Modified on 8/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2019 Filing 41 Declaration of Stephen A. Broome in Support of #40 MOTION to Dismiss , Stay, or Transfer filed byIMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #40 ) (Broome, Stephen) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss , Stay, or Transfer filed by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 8/29/2019. Replies due by 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broome, Stephen) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration of Marlo A. Pecora in Support of #38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed byIMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Related document(s) #38 ) (Broome, Stephen) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broome, Stephen) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Veeva Systems Inc. re #1 Complaint, , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veeva Systems Inc.. IQVIA Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Elkhunovich, Oleg) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Veeva Systems Inc. re #1 Complaint, , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veeva Systems Inc.. IMS Software Services, LTD served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Elkhunovich, Oleg) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Veeva Systems Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Elkhunovich, Oleg) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IQVIA Holdings Inc. for IQVIA Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Stake, Sam) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael B. Brightman. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ryan Caughey. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James T. Southwick. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael S. Qin. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christopher M. Sarma. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kylie Chiseul Kim. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Daniel S. Severson. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Steven F. Benz. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Michael Brightman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597704.) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Brightman, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Caughey ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597689.) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Caughey, Ryan) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by James Southwick ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597644.) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Southwick, James) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Michael Qin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597628.) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Qin, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Sarma ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597613.) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Sarma, Christopher) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Chiseul Kim ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597593.) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Kim, Chiseul) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Severson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597575.) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Severson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Steven Benz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597534.) filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Benz, Steven) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Thomas Reinheimer (Reinheimer, Justin) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Andrew Broome (Broome, Stephen) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc... (Stake, Sam) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #10 Notice (Other) To Defendants' Local Rule 3-13 Notice by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Elkhunovich, Oleg) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions (Local Rule 3-13) (Stake, Sam) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Stephen Stake (Stake, Sam) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Veeva Systems Inc... (Elkhunovich, Oleg) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to IQVIA Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to IMS Software Services, LTD. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Elkhunovich, Oleg) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Elkhunovich, Oleg) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against IMS Software Services, LTD, IQVIA Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13531895.). Filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Elkhunovich, Oleg) (Filed on 7/18/2019) Modified on 7/19/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veeva Systems Inc. v. IQVIA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMS SOFTWARE SERVICES, LTD.
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Broome
Represented By: Stephen A. Swedlow
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Justin Thomas Reinheimer
Represented By: Marlo A Pecora
Represented By: Sam Stephen Stake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQVIA INC.
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Broome
Represented By: Stephen A. Swedlow
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Justin Thomas Reinheimer
Represented By: Marlo A Pecora
Represented By: Sam Stephen Stake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veeva Systems Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Sarma
Represented By: Jenna Golda Farleigh
Represented By: James Thurlow Southwick
Represented By: Michael S. Qin
Represented By: Michael B Brightman
Represented By: Chiseul Kim
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Ryan Vincent Caughey
Represented By: Steven F. Benz
Represented By: Daniel Steven Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?