BERMUDEZ-PAIZ v. EDWARDS et al
Petitioner: Jose Candelario Bermudez-Paiz
Respondent: ICE NY Director THOMAS DECKER, Acting DHS Secretary KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Attorney General WILLIAM BARR, HCCC DIRECTOR RONALD P. EDWARDS, THOMAS DECKER, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, RONALD P. EDWARDS and WILLIAM BARR
Case Number: 2:2019cv18617
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by RONALD P. EDWARDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit B, Criminal History Chart, #3 Exhibit C, September 27, 2019 IJ Decision, #4 Exhibit D, Form I-830, #5 Declaration of Elizabeth Burgus)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for RONALD P. EDWARDS added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Respondents KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, WILLIAM BARR and THOMAS DECKER are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition and this Order upon the lone remaining respondent, Charles Green by regular mail. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Order to the Civil Division Chief, United States Attorneys Office. Within forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file an answer to the Petition. Petitioner may file and serve a reply within thirty (30) days after the answer is filed. etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/8/2019. (dam, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Civil Cover Sheet by JOSE CANDELARIO BERMUDEZ-PAIZ. (ROCKOFF, JESSE)
October 2, 2019 Judge John Michael Vazquez added. (ps, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0312-10007467.), filed by JOSE CANDELARIO BERMUDEZ-PAIZ.(ROCKOFF, JESSE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERMUDEZ-PAIZ v. EDWARDS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE NY Director THOMAS DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting DHS Secretary KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HCCC DIRECTOR RONALD P. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THOMAS DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD P. EDWARDS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Candelario Bermudez-Paiz
Represented By: JESSE ALAN ROCKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?