UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $301,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND ASSORTED JEWELRY VALUED AT $213,636
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $301,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND ASSORTED JEWELRY VALUED AT $213,636
Case Number: 2:2019cv18621
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT AND FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE; New Art Jewelry Limited agrees to the Forfeiture to the United States of $165,660 of the seized $301,200 pursuant to pursuant to Title 21 United States Code, Section 881(a)(6) and Title 18, United States Code, Section 981, which represents 55% of the seized cash; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/18/2019. (sms)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from United States. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent and Final Order of Forfeiture)(DEVLIN, SARAH)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney PETER W. GAETA terminated. Attorney SARAH DEVLIN for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (DEVLIN, SARAH)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 First ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(MO, ELIZABETH)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by All Defendants re #3 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint, #2 Notice (Other) Notice of Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEA Jewelry Appraisal, #2 Exhibit 1 - 96 Invoice Schedule - Chinese and English, #3 Exhibit 2 - 1 - 96 Invoices - Chinese, #4 Exhibit 2 - 1 - 49 Invoices - English, #5 Exhibit 2 - 50 - 96 Invoices - English, #6 Exhibit 3 - Schedule of Bank Deposits, #7 Exhibit 4 - Bank Deposit Slips, #8 Exhibit 5 - Sunlite International LLC Reciept, #9 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Lih Wong, #10 Exhibit 6A - Sunlite International LLC Reciept, #11 Exhibit 6B - Kitco Gold Prices as of Aug. 15, 2018, #12 Exhibit 6C - Phone Records, #13 Exhibit Declaration of Eddie Hsaio, #14 Exhibit 7A - Sunlite International LLC Reciept, #15 Exhibit 7B - Kitco Gold Prices as of Aug. 15, 2018, #16 Exhibit 7C - Phone Records)(MO, ELIZABETH)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT for Arrest In Rem issued (jc, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Complaint for Forfeiture (GAETA, PETER)
October 2, 2019 Judge Esther Salas added. (ps, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $301,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND ASSORTED JEWELRY VALUED AT $213,636, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrant in Rem)(GAETA, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $301,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND ASSORTED JEWELRY VALUED AT $213,636
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $301,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND ASSORTED JEWELRY VALUED AT $213,636
Represented By: ELIZABETH LI MO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: PETER W. GAETA
Represented By: SARAH DEVLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?