STIRRUP METAL PRODUCTS CORP. v. COMEQ, INC. et at
Plaintiff: STIRRUP METAL PRODUCTS CORP.
Defendant: COMEQ, INC., EUROMAC S.P.A., CORPORATIONS ABC, XYZ, AND EFG, JOHN DOE and JANE ROE
Case Number: 2:2019cv18831
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration #6 is Granted; the claims against Defendant Comeq be Dismissed; Plaintiff's Motion to Amend #9 is Denied. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/25/2020. (sm)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/25/2020. (sm)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Motion for a ninety-day extension of time to effect service on defendant through 5/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/20/2020. (sm)
February 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION Extension of Time for Service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(M) . Motion set for 3/2/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION Extension of Time for Service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(M) by STIRRUP METAL PRODUCTS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MOTZENBECKER, DOUGLAS)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by COMEQ, INC. re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Stay Discovery Pending Motion, and Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #9 Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stephen A. Lazinsky, #2 Certification of Service)(LEE, SUNA)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER; granting #10 Defendant Comeq, Inc.'s letter request for an extension of time to file its Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion Dismiss/Compel Arbitration on February 4, 2020; etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/22/2020. (sms)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Suna Lee. (LEE, SUNA)
January 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Motion set for 2/18/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by STIRRUP METAL PRODUCTS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(MOTZENBECKER, DOUGLAS)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER; granting #7 plaintiff Stirrup Metal Products, Corp. letter request to extend the filing deadline for Plaintiff's papers in opposition by three weeks, until Monday, January 13, 2020; and defendant shall have two weeks to file its reply, or until Monday, January 27, 2020; etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/20/2019. (sms)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Douglas Motzenbecker, Esq.. (MOTZENBECKER, DOUGLAS)
December 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Stay Discovery Pending Motion, and Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Stay Discovery Pending Motion, and Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by COMEQ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Suna Lee, Esq., #3 Certificate of Service of Suna Lee, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order Order)(LEE, SUNA)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; The time for Defendant to file an Answer or otherwise responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is hereby extended to November 30, 2019; and a copy of this Order shall be served upon all counsel of record via ECF; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/17/2019. (sms)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Suna Lee re Update Answer Due Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LEE, SUNA)
October 10, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by COMEQ, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/30/19. (jc, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Comeq, Inc... (LEE, SUNA)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by SUNA LEE on behalf of COMEQ, INC. (LEE, SUNA)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COMEQ, INC. from Essex County Superior Court, case number ESX-L-5936-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10024913), filed by COMEQ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement, #3 Certificate of Service)(LEE, SUNA)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
October 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STIRRUP METAL PRODUCTS CORP. v. COMEQ, INC. et at
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMEQ, INC.
Represented By: SUNA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUROMAC S.P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORATIONS ABC, XYZ, AND EFG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STIRRUP METAL PRODUCTS CORP.
Represented By: DOUGLAS E. MOTZENBECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?