BARTLETT et al v. PBF ENERGY, INC.
Petitioner: JOSHUA EBRIGHT, DAVID RINALDI, PAUL LEE, KRISTINE SNYDER and RICHARD BARTLETT
Respondent: PBF ENERGY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv18909
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (JB, )
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER vacating #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas. It is further Ordered that this matter be Closed. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/18/2019. (JB, )
November 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0312-10031092.) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Vacate Motion Date and Close Matter)(VASH, SERINA)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: At Respondent's request, and with Petitioner's consent, the return date of the pending motion to compel is reset for November 18, 2019. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 11/1/19. (LM, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN JOHN KAISER on behalf of PBF ENERGY, INC. (KAISER, STEVEN)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0312-10031092.) . (KAISER, STEVEN)
October 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0312-10031092.). Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 11, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0312-10031092.), filed by DAVID RINALDI, RICHARD BARTLETT, PAUL LEE, JOSHUA EBRIGHT, KRISTINE SNYDER. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration InSupport of Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit 1-8 to Aguilar Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service SM Vash)(VASH, SERINA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARTLETT et al v. PBF ENERGY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSHUA EBRIGHT
Represented By: SERINA MARIE VASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID RINALDI
Represented By: SERINA MARIE VASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAUL LEE
Represented By: SERINA MARIE VASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KRISTINE SNYDER
Represented By: SERINA MARIE VASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICHARD BARTLETT
Represented By: SERINA MARIE VASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PBF ENERGY, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN JOHN KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?