Torres Martinez v. Decker et al
Petitioner: Hugo Torres Martinez
Respondent: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan, Attorney General WILLIAM BARR and H.O. THOMAS DECKER
Case Number: 2:2019cv18940
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-08727. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 10, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey (ks)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER OF VENUE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties that this action shall be and hereby is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, Newark Division, and that the seven-day waiting period in Local Civil Rule 83.1 is waived. SO ORDERED this 9th day of October, 2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/9/2019) (ks)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Hugo Torres Martinez. (Levine, Zoe)
October 3, 2019 Mailed a copy of #7 Order to Show Cause, by certified mail no. 7018 1130 0001 1826 7383 to United States Attorney's Office SDNY 86 Chambers Street New York NY 10007. (vba) Modified on 10/3/2019 (vba).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than October 10, 2019 why the Court should not dismiss Petitioner's habeas claim and/or transfer this action to the District of New Jersey pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order by certified mail upon the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/02/2019) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zoe Pokempner Levine on behalf of Hugo Torres Martinez. (Levine, Zoe)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated October 1, 2019 re: request for withdrawal of the reference to the magistrate judge. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan.(Byars, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan. (Byars, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Habeas Corpus. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/20/2019) (ama)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mathur, Suchita)
September 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Suchita Deolalikar Mathur. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
September 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Suchita Deolalikar Mathur. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17631216)Document filed by Hugo Torres Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. NTA, #2 Exhibit B. DHS Evidence, #3 Exhibit C. IJ Decision)(Mathur, Suchita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres Martinez v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H.O. THOMAS DECKER
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hugo Torres Martinez
Represented By: Suchita Deolalikar Mathur
Represented By: Zoe Pokempner Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?