IN RE: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE FROM THE NATIONAL COURT OF ORIGINAL JURISIDICTION NO. 36 IN BUENOS AIRES, ARGENTINA IN THE MATTER OF PABLO PATRICIO TOLOSA V. MONDELEZ ARGENTINA S.A., ET AL.
Petitioner: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
In Re: IN RE: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE FROM THE NATIONAL COURT OF ORIGINAL JURISDICTION NO. 36 IN BUENOS AIRES, ARGENTINA IN THE MATTER OF PABLO PATRICIO TOLOSA V. MONDELEZ ARGENTINA S.A., ET AL
Case Number: 2:2019cv19023
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1782
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Katerina Ossenova, Trial Attorney for the U.S. Department of Justice, hereby is appointed Commissioner of this Court, to obtain by subpoena the requested evidence from UBS Financial Services for transmission to the U.S. Department of Justice, Office of foreign Litigation, Office of international Judicial Assistance, for transmission to the National Court of Original Jurisdiction Number 36 in Buenos Aires, Argentina in Pablo Patricio Tolosa v. Mondelez Argentina S.A., et al.; and to do all else that may be necessary for the accomplishment of the purpose of this Order; that the Office of International Judicial Assistance shall provide UBS Financial Services in Weehawken, New Jersey with a copy of this Order and the accompanying documents. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/5/2019. (sm)
October 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #1 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
October 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Memorandum, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(OSSENOVA, KATERINA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE FROM THE NATIONAL COURT OF ORIGINAL JURISIDICTION NO. 36 IN BUENOS AIRES, ARGENTINA IN THE MATTER OF PABLO PATRICIO TOLOSA V. MONDELEZ ARGENTINA S.A., ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN RE: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE FROM THE NATIONAL COURT OF ORIGINAL JURISDICTION NO. 36 IN BUENOS AIRES, ARGENTINA IN THE MATTER OF PABLO PATRICIO TOLOSA V. MONDELEZ ARGENTINA S.A., ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: KATERINA V. OSSENOVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?