MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC. v. ANDERSON et al
Plaintiff: MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Defendant: JOSEPH ANDERSON and WESTERN EXPRESS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv19103
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC. identifying BSA World Wide Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (MCQUADE, LISA)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim by MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC..(MCQUADE, LISA)
November 8, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/22/2019. (ams, ) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ams, ).
November 8, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Lisa Mcquade on 11/7/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future filings of this kind, please use the event Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order under Other Documents.This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (MCQUADE, LISA)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA MARIE MCQUADE on behalf of MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC. (MCQUADE, LISA)
October 18, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
October 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN MICHAEL VOGEL on behalf of JOSEPH ANDERSON, WESTERN EXPRESS, INC. (VOGEL, JUSTIN)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC. by WESTERN EXPRESS, INC., JOSEPH ANDERSON.(BAUER, MATTHEW)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WESTERN EXPRESS, INC.. (BAUER, MATTHEW)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTERN EXPRESS, INC., JOSEPH ANDERSON from Morris County Superior Court, case number MRS-L-1945-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10044019), filed by WESTERN EXPRESS, INC., JOSEPH ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Clerk of Superior Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Notice to Adverse Party of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAUER, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC. v. ANDERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH ANDERSON
Represented By: MATTHEW WILKEN BAUER
Represented By: JUSTIN MICHAEL VOGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN EXPRESS, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW WILKEN BAUER
Represented By: JUSTIN MICHAEL VOGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIDWEST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: PHILIP ARNOLD KAHN
Represented By: LISA MARIE MCQUADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?