APONTE, et al v. LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS et al
Plaintiff: KERRY STEED, KIMMIE MARTIN, PAMELA DRISKELL, KIM PARROTT, GARY SCHWALL, JEFFREY GRUSHKA, JOANN APONTE, CATLIN STANFORD, TODD STONE, LEO GALLAGHER-KOWIT and MEGAN STOREY
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS and AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv19149
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 10/21/19 from the Middle District of North Carolina, for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
October 21, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00824. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-4) transferring this action to the District of New Jersey. (Daniel, J)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) by MDL No. 2904 transferring this action to the DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY for the reasons stated in the order of August 27, 2019. Received and filed on 10/18/2019. (Daniel, J)
August 28, 2019 Answer updated to 9/13/2019 for AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC. (Daniel, J)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail Return Receipt as to AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (MASON, GARY)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS and LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA. Waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (MASON, GARY) Modified on 8/28/2019 to remove duplicate text. (Daniel, J)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GARY E. MASON on behalf of Plaintiffs JOANN APONTE, PAMELA DRISKELL, LEO GALLAGHER-KOWIT, JEFFREY GRUSHKA, KIMMIE MARTIN, KIM PARROTT, GARY SCHWALL, CATLIN STANFORD, KERRY STEED, TODD STONE, MEGAN STOREY (MASON, GARY)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by JOANN APONTE, PAMELA DRISKELL, LEO GALLAGHER-KOWIT, JEFFREY GRUSHKA, KIMMIE MARTIN, KIM PARROTT, GARY SCHWALL, CATLIN STANFORD, KERRY STEED, TODD STONE, MEGAN STOREY of Special Appearance of Nicholas J. Elia (ELIA, NICHOLAS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by JOANN APONTE, PAMELA DRISKELL, LEO GALLAGHER-KOWIT, JEFFREY GRUSHKA, KIMMIE MARTIN, KIM PARROTT, GARY SCHWALL, CATLIN STANFORD, KERRY STEED, TODD STONE, MEGAN STOREY of Special Appearance of Charles E. Schaffer (SCHAFFER, CHARLES)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. (Attachments: #1 Holdings, #2 AMC)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2629438.)(Related Case # 1:19-cv-00609, 1:19-cv-00616, 1:19-cv-00627, 1:19-cv-00702), filed by Kim Parrott, Leo Gallagher-Kowit, Gary Schwall, Kerry Steed, Pamela Driskell, Megan Storey, Catlin Stanford, Joann Aponte, Jeffrey Grushka, Todd Stone, Kimmie Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BRYSON, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APONTE, et al v. LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRY STEED
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMMIE MARTIN
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA DRISKELL
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM PARROTT
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY SCHWALL
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY GRUSHKA
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN APONTE
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATLIN STANFORD
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD STONE
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEO GALLAGHER-KOWIT
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN STOREY
Represented By: GARY E. MASON
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?