FIGUEROA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: ANDRES B FIGUEROA
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv19527
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
December 3, 2019 COMPLAINT see document #1 against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Filing and Admin fee $ IFP Granted), filed by ANDRES B FIGUEROA.(ld, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff be permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs; that the Clerk shall file the Complaint without prepayment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/3/2019. (ld, )
October 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas. (jr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(LANGTON, JAMES) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (lag, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIGUEROA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRES B FIGUEROA
Represented By: JAMES LANGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?