JOHN J. VACCARO M.D. P.A. v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JOHN J. VACCARO M.D. P.A.
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv19664
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 11/25/19. (cm, )
November 24, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
October 31, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10077807), filed by JOHN J. VACCARO M.D. P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - P, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHN J. VACCARO M.D. P.A. v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. VACCARO M.D. P.A.
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?