FARROW v. U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: BETH FARROW
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HCC INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., CRAWFORD & COMPANY and MCLARENS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv19930
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CRAWFORD & COMPANY, HCC INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #5 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, ROBERT)
December 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by BETH FARROW. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(GAGLIANO, JOHN)
November 15, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Answer to Complaint submitted by VITO A. PINTO on 11/6/19 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (qa, )
November 8, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
November 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CRAWFORD & COMPANY, HCC INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal,, (BROWN, ROBERT)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HCC INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (BROWN, ROBERT)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRAWFORD & COMPANY. (BROWN, ROBERT)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRAWFORD & COMPANY, HCC INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of Passaic County, NJ, case number L-002598-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10092370), filed by CRAWFORD & COMPANY, HCC INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Superior Court Action Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit U.S. Speciatly and HCC Answer, #3 Exhibit McLarens Answer, #4 Exhibit Crawford Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(BROWN, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FARROW v. U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT J. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT J. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAWFORD & COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT J. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCLARENS, INC.
Represented By: VITO A. PINTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH FARROW
Represented By: JOHN JOSEPH GAGLIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?