WEINTRAUB v. DAUHATSU INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO DE MOVEIS E APARELHOS ELECTRICOS LTDA et al
Plaintiff: WENDY WEINTRAUB
Defendant: NEW CONCEPTION IMPORT & EXPORT CORPORATION, ABC CORP 1-20(fictitious), DAUHATSU INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO DE MOVEIS E APARELHOS ELECTRICOS LTDA, DBA TAIFF, AMAZON.COM INC., AMAZON.COM, INC., ABC CORP. (1-20) and DAUHATSU INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO DE MOVEIS E APARELHOS ELECTRICOS LTDA
Case Number: 2:2019cv19953
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT ORDER consolidating cases for Pretrial Purposes ONLY granting #11 Defendant's Consent Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case No. 2:18-cv-09038 (KM)(CLW) and Case No. 2:19-cv-19953 (KM)(CLW) are hereby consolidated under Case No. 2:18-cv-09038 (KM)(CLW) for purposes of case management and pretrial discovery only. All subsequent filings in either of the above-captioned actions shall be filed in the first filed action, Case No. 2:18-cv-09038 (KM)(CLW). etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/2/2020. (dam, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Rose, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ROSE, BETH)
December 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
December 23, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM, INC.. (ROSE, BETH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against AMAZON.COM, INC. by AMAZON.COM, INC..(ROSE, BETH)
December 18, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to New Conception Import & Export Corporation for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ams, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Default by WENDY WEINTRAUB against New Conception Import & Export Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification)(DUFFY, PAUL)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WENDY WEINTRAUB. AMAZON.COM, INC. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (DUFFY, PAUL)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WENDY WEINTRAUB. NEW CONCEPTION IMPORT & EXPORT CORPORATION served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (DUFFY, PAUL)
December 2, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON.COM, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/20/2019. (ams, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (LODATO, VINCENT)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT R. LODATO on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC. (LODATO, VINCENT)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC. (ROSE, BETH)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMAZON.COM, INC., DAUHATSU INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO DE MOVEIS E APARELHOS ELECTRICOS LTDA, NEW CONCEPTION IMPORT & EXPORT CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10095450), filed by WENDY WEINTRAUB.(DUFFY, PAUL)
November 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEINTRAUB v. DAUHATSU INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO DE MOVEIS E APARELHOS ELECTRICOS LTDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW CONCEPTION IMPORT & EXPORT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP 1-20(fictitious)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAUHATSU INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO DE MOVEIS E APARELHOS ELECTRICOS LTDA, DBA TAIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: VINCENT R. LODATO
Represented By: BETH S. ROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. (1-20)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAUHATSU INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO DE MOVEIS E APARELHOS ELECTRICOS LTDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY WEINTRAUB
Represented By: PAUL R. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?