Santaneglo v. Santangelo et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Santaneglo
Defendant: Adriana Santangelo, Adrian Brown, Lorna T. Lumpris and William Riddick, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv19984
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jr)
November 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-08875. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 31, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey (jca)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Accordingly this matter is TRANSFERRED to the District of New Jersey. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/31/2019) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from John P Beyel dated October 25 2019 re: transfer venue. Document filed by Stephanie Santaneglo.(Beyel, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Stephanie Santaneglo ; amending #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Adriana Santangelo, Lorna T. Lumpris. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farinella, Thomas)
September 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas A. Farinella to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Amended Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF must be titled to correspond with the event type used. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Farinella, Thomas)
September 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thomas A. Farinella. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Stephanie Santaneglo ; amending #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Adriana Santangelo, Lorna T. Lumpris. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farinella, Thomas) Modified on 9/26/2019 (jgo).
September 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas A. Farinella. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Stephanie Santangelo, Adriana Santangelo, William Riddick, Lorna Lumpris. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division, County of Morris County. Case Number: MRS-L-001775-19. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17657419).Document filed by Adriana Santangelo, Lorna Lumpris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Farinella, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santaneglo v. Santangelo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Santangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna T. Lumpris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Riddick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Santaneglo
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP BEYEL
Represented By: FRAN J. GARB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?